Van Zyl, Lizette (CPSO#: 78852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound family health team
1415 1 ST AVE W
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 470-3035
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornelius Johannes Van Zyl and Lizette Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Zyl ( CPSO# 78064 )
Dr. L. Van Zyl ( CPSO# 78852 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
875 Sixth Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5W5
Phone Number: (519) 367-4420

Business Address:
Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIZETTE VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2003