Van Zyl, Louis Theo (CPSO#: 74267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sleep & Alertness Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 800
P.O. Box 32
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 837-8181 Ext. 203
Fax: (647) 427-4928
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis T. Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Zyl ( CPSO# 74267 )

Business Address:
Sleep & Alertness Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 950
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 837-8181

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS THEO VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999