VanHouwelingen, Lisa Taylor (CPSO#: 86570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa VanHouwelingen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. VanHouwelingen ( CPSO# 86570 )

Business Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 02 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA TAYLOR VANHOUWELINGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANHOUWELINGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Nov 2008 to 02 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Nov 2009 to 25 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017