VanderSpek, Susan Christine (CPSO#: 89091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
650 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M2K 3E4
Phone: (416) 222-7775
Fax: (416) 222-7785
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN CHRISTINE VANDERSPEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERSPEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011