Vanderveen, Jessica Anne (CPSO#: 92879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamiton Program for Schizophrenia
20 Hughson Street South
Suite 405
Hamilton ON  L8N 2A1
Phone: (905) 525-2832
Fax: 905-546-0055
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 West 5th Street
Harbour North 2
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36294
Fax: 905-381-5602
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE VANDERVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERVEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2016 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016