Vanier, Kelly Lynne (CPSO#: 79109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 303/305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: (613) 779-8686
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Vanier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vanier ( CPSO# 79109 )

Business Address:
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY LYNNE VANIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2006 to 24 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007