Vardy, Janette Lorraine (CPSO#: 78919)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 23 Jun 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2007