Varghese, Boji (CPSO#: 78623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Bangalore University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 523-5663
Fax: (705) 523-1377
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Diabetes Education and Care Program
Out patient centre, Memorial Site
Health Sciences North, Sudbury, ON
865 Regent St South P3E 3Y9
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-6601
Fax: (705) 671-5634
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boji Varghese and Cizy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Varghese ( CPSO# 78623 )
Dr. C. Mathew ( CPSO# 79348 )

Business Address:
410 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 523-5663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOJI VARGHESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARGHESE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2002 to 14 Apr 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2003