Varley, Kevin Robert (CPSO#: 82626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville, ON
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649 Ext. 2400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Varley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Varley ( CPSO# 82626 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT VARLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013