Varma, Rajeev (CPSO#: 80483)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Feb 2004 to 15 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2005