Varner, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of North Carolina, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH VARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2011