Varughese, Rhea Ann (CPSO#: 93922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital Lung Transplant Program 11 PMB 150 585 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 25 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018