Vasan, Hariharan (CPSO#: 80758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Wharton Medical Clinic
2951 Walkers Line, Main Floor
Burlington
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: (905) 592-2301
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Vasan ( CPSO# 80758 )

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 387-4647

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
M14 - 414 Victoria Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8

Business Address:
Wharton Medicial Clinic
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARIHARAN VASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008