Vasileiadis, Georgios (CPSO#: 75614)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ioannina, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2003