Vasudev, Akshya (CPSO#: 94388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Zone A Door 4-A2607
Department of Psychiatry
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 17078
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasudev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vasudev ( CPSO# 94388 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Hospital-Zone A Door 4
Suites A2 607
Department of Psychiatry
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Akshya Vasudev may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of  Western  Ontario, in which Dr. Vasudev
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Vasudev no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.