Vasudeva, Pratibha Rajvanshi (CPSO#: 77415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Rolling Hills Drive, Suite 110
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 943-1094
Fax: (519) 943-1095
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. R. Vasudeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vasudeva ( CPSO# 77415 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2702

Business Address:
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Unit 110
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 943-1094

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Jun 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Pratibha  Rajvanshi  Vasudeva  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            obstetrics and gynaecology, only.