Vayalumkal, Claire Marie (CPSO#: 91341)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre, 505 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Date Received: 02 Jan 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2017