Vecchiarelli, Jonathan Paul (CPSO#: 92947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 2B
1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9R 4E1
Phone: (416) 645-1035
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Vecchiarelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vecchiarelli ( CPSO# 92947 )

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes & Endocrinology
2B - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9R 4E1
Phone Number: (416) 645-1035

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN PAUL VECCHIARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VECCHIARELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2015