Velasco Larach, Maria Soledad (CPSO#: 94319)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2012