Velehorschi, Corina Mariana (CPSO#: 81931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry, 3rd Floor
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Telemedicine via OTNhub.ca
(E-consults)
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Email: ssoil@docudavit.com
Date Received: 08 Jul 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINA MARIANA VELEHORSCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELEHORSCHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007