Venitelli, Zeah Natasha (CPSO#: 113677)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2018