Venkatesan, Varagur Mohan (CPSO#: 54592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Bangalore University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 10
27 northcrest drive
London ON  N5X4P4
Canada
Phone: 519 660 0571
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

unit 10
27 northcrest drive
London ON  N5X 4P4
Canada
Phone: 519 660 0571
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venkatesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Venkatesan ( CPSO# 54963 )
Dr. V. Venkatesan ( CPSO# 54592 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
P O Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARAGUR MOHAN VENKATESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991