Venkateswaran, Vikram (CPSO#: 82599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Orthopaedic Associates
1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 200
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-8883
Fax: (289) 801-9930
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram Venkateswaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Venkateswaran ( CPSO# 82599 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Orthopaedic Associates
200 - 1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 873-8883

Business Address:
Fracture Clinic
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
David Bradley Sports Clinic
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM VENKATESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2011