Verbeeten, Katherine (CPSO#: 89123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: Houston, Katherine (used until: 06 Feb 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Department of Endocrinology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3939
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE VERBEETEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBEETEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016