Verbine, Anton Evgenyevich (CPSO#: 89737)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2011