Vergel de Dios, Jennifer Ann (CPSO#: 90900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anesthesia and Perioperative
Medicine, Western University
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road Room C3 108
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vergel de Dios Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vergel de Dios ( CPSO# 90900 )

Business Address:
Western University-University Hospital
Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN VERGEL DE DIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERGEL DE DIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015