Vergidis, Dimitrios (CPSO#: 63352)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North Western Ontario Regional Cancer Centre Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Cetnre 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018