Vergie, Christopher Iain Elwyn (CPSO#: 103424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of National Defence
101 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON  K1A 0Z4
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER IAIN ELWYN VERGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERGIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2018