Verhovsek, Madeleine Mary (CPSO#: 80732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room F-304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Shea and Verhovsek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Shea ( CPSO# 77606 )
Dr. M. Verhovsek ( CPSO# 80732 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hopsital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Room F304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELEINE MARY VERHOVSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERHOVSEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2008