Verma, Ashim (CPSO#: 96104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Heart Institute
Suite 201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: 519-977-6643
Fax: 519-915-6326
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashim Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verma ( CPSO# 96104 )

Business Address:
Windsor Heart Institute
201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 7, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 7, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ashim Verma voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH until August 20, 2018, during the course of an investigation by WRH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHIM VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2011 to 30 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: August 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[August 2, 2018]
1. Reside at specified address.
2. Notify the Officer in Charge (or designate) LaSalle Police Services at 1880 Normandy St., LaSalle, ON of his address in writing within 24 hours of any change in his address.
3. Do not possess or use any computers or any other device that has access to the Internet or other digital network EXCEPT: as may be required for purposes of his work or a recognized educational or vocational program.
4. Not to be in the presence of any persons under the age of 14 unless he is in the presence of a responsible adult.
5. Not to attend any park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 14 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground, or community centre unless in the presence of a responsible adult.


Source: Other
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.
The follow are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College:

(1) Two counts of possession of child pornography (computer graphic images and videos) on or about January 25, 2018 and August 2, 2018 at the town of LaSalle, contrary to section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

(2) Making available child pornography (computer graphic video), on or about January 25, 2018, contrary to section 163.1(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge: August 2, 2018
Place of Charges: LaSalle, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police