Verma, Narpendra (CPSO#: 43199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Verma ( CPSO# 43199 )

Business Address:
50 Cindy Lane
RR 1
Lisle ON  L0M 1M0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Oct 2005
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Narpendra Verma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 23, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Verma failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Verma resigned from the College and other jurisdictions in which he was entitled to practice medicine and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.