Verma, Neil (CPSO#: 85845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-6526
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Verma ( CPSO# 85845 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006