Verma, Subodh (CPSO#: 75100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Terrence Donnelly Heart Centre
Cardiovascular & Thoracic Surgery
Suite 8 003 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5997
Fax: (416) 864-5881
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Diagnostic&Cardiac Ctre
250 Marlee Avenue
North York ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5997
Fax: (416) 864-5881
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4810 Medical Clinic
4810 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 225
Scarborough ON M1S4N6
Scarborough ON  M1S 4N6
Canada
Phone: 416 864-5997
Fax: 416 864-5881
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subodh Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Verma ( CPSO# 75100 )

Business Address:
250 Marlee Avenue
North York ON  M6B 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 864-5997

Business Address:
225 - 4810 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4N6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5997

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
8th Floor 8 - 003
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5997

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 17 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBODH VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007