Verocai, Flavia Gomes (CPSO#: 83705)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: Flaman, Flavia Verocai (used until: 11 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2005 to 04 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2011