Vesely, Alexander Eugene (CPSO#: 90039)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2013