Vezi, Zwelithini Brian (CPSO#: 89619)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Natal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Jul 2008 to 12 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010