Vicus, Danielle Lyn (CPSO#: 90400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011

Expiry Date:  03 Nov 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Lyn Vicus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vicus ( CPSO# 90400 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre Suite T2018
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2009 to 19 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 03 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Danielle Lyn Vicus may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics   &  Gynaecology,  Division  of  Gynaecologic  Oncology,
                        University of  Toronto,  in  which   Dr.  Vicus  holds  an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  expire  on  the  earlier of the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on November 3, 2020,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Vicus no longer holds the academic appointment at the rank
                        of   Assistant   Professor  in  the  Department  of  Obstetrics   &
                        Gynaecology, Division of Gynaecologic Oncology at the University of
                        Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Vicus' certificate of
                        registration, following  consideration  of  the practice assessment
                        report.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives a report indicating that Dr. Vicus' clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  November  4,  2011.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 3, 2020.