Viero, Sandra (CPSO#: 71970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Laboratories
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6928
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA VIERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 1997 to 19 Dec 1997
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2000