Vigh, Sandor Gyula (CPSO#: 18013)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Dec 1985
Summary:

 In December 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vigh guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Vigh's licence to practice be suspended for a period of 120 days.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Nov 1985