Vijayakanthan, Niranjan (CPSO#: 92958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
107 Shirreff ave
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 495-2212
Fax: 705 316 0888
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niranjan Vijayakanthan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Vijayakanthan ( CPSO# 92958 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIRANJAN VIJAYAKANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYAKANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015