Villamere, James Patrick (CPSO#: 91023)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Patrick Villamere to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 15, 2017:

Dr. Villamere has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.