Villeneuve, Patrick James (CPSO#: 77486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 6362
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8845
Fax: (613) 737-8668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick James Villeneuve Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Villeneuve ( CPSO# 77486 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room 6362
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 06 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JAMES VILLENEUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLENEUVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009