Villeneuve, Pierre-Marc (CPSO#: 92251)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2009 to 06 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018