Vincent, Ajoy (CPSO#: 92365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2014

Expiry Date:  31 May 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8942
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vincent ( CPSO# 92365 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8942

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ajoy Vincent may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Ophthalmology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Vincent holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Vincent  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Vincent's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Vincent's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 31, 2021.