Vincent, Daniel Armand (CPSO#: 95445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Palliative Care
PO Box 17046
1937 Portobello Blvd.
Orleans ON  K4A 4W8
Phone: 613-422-1255
Fax: 613-212-1231
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hôpital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vincent ( CPSO# 95445 )
Dr. S. Veldhuijzen Van Zanten ( CPSO# 98333 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Orleans ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1937 Portobello Boulevard
PO Box 17046
Ottawa ON  K4A 4W8
Phone Number: (613) 422-1255

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ARMAND VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013