Vincent, Lloyd (CPSO#: 78270)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Bangalore University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008