Vinik, Ophir (CPSO#: 88873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
3 057 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5295
Fax: (416) 864-5139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ophir Vinik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vinik ( CPSO# 88873 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division Rheumatology
3 057 Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5295

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OPHIR VINIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012