Virani, Saniff Bahadurali (CPSO#: 103964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 8076846000
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Nov 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANIFF BAHADURALI VIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2017 to 16 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Sep 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017