Virdee, Manjit Singh (CPSO#: 61047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McLaughlin Village Medical Clinic
85 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0K3
Phone: (905) 455-9374
Fax: (905) 455-9505
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manjit Virdee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Virdee ( CPSO# 61047 )

Business Address:
McLaughlin Village Medical Clinic
85 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0K3
Phone Number: (905) 455-9374

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANJIT SINGH VIRDEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRDEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990