Virich, George (CPSO#: 88794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (226) 448-0044
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Virich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Virich ( CPSO# 88794 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE VIRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014